Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa
CC28554
9429042845836
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 19165
Hamilton
3244
59 Higgins Road
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

027 355 5064


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Runanga o Kirikiriroa Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust
Trok Building Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Rūnanga was mandated to focus on issues relating to Article III of the Treaty of Waitangi, and, represent the needs of Maataa waka and Pacific peoples who live within Hamilton.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Housing / Health Care

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Mental Health / Accommodation / Housing

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Mental Health Clients

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Trok Building Limited CC43952

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 25/11/2024 $18,542,866 $17,884,844 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 31/12/2023 $17,696,568 $15,051,738 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 23/11/2022 $15,559,272 $12,833,239 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $12,472,477 $9,636,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 18/12/2020 $8,804,805 $7,472,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/01/2020 10/12/2019 $6,483,856 $5,898,625 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 23/12/2018 $6,501,587 $5,952,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2018 $4,540,058 $5,464,129 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 9/02/2017 $7,522,920 $5,606,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/12/2015 $6,670,056 $6,821,745 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sharlene Henry Trustee 28/02/2025
Shayne Wihongi Deputy Chair 1/03/2023
Kim Cable Trustee 18/11/2022
Anthony Rawiri Trustee 1/10/2022
Hagen Tautari Chairman 7/08/2019
Nonu Tuisamoa Trustee 4/04/2009
Owen Purcell Trustee 30/06/2008
Rangi Martell Trustee 7/11/2004
Siapu Tyrell Trustee 10/08/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brad Totorewa Trustee 3/02/2025
Karleen Puriri Board Co-Chair 14/11/2024
Rangiuia Riki Trustee 31/05/2022
Mike Rarere Trustee 31/12/2021
Maree Virginia Pene Trustee 4/12/2019
Tureiti Moxon Trustee 13/12/2018
Glen Tupuhi Trustee 2/11/2018
Roma Cherry Balzer Trustee 1/07/2017
Matiu Dickson Chairman 30/03/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2025 NOC024
17/03/2025 NOC022
11/02/2025 NOC021
14/11/2024 NOC019
18/05/2023 NOC017
21/12/2021 NOC015
10/12/2019 NOC011
11/07/2019 NOC010
28/02/2018 NOC007
3/08/2016 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.