Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Sisters of Mercy Elderly Outreach Limited
CC31593
9429037203047
Deregistered
31/03/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Sisters of Mercy Elderly Outreach Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/03/2024 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
9 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry on and promote the charitable and apostolic and religious activities of the Congregation in connection with Community Support Services for the Elderly.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Religious activities

Older people

Entity Structure

The company is managed by the board which consists of 4 directors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Harkins Director 10/03/2015
Katrina Fabish Director 10/03/2015
Patricia Rowe Director 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rita Joan Vessey Director 1/07/2015
Anne Pauline Campbell Director 10/03/2015
Reuben William O' Neill Director 10/03/2015
Denise Margaret Fox Director 19/02/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/03/2015 NOC003
25/02/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.