Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hugo Charitable Trust
Hugo
CC54425
N/A
Registered

Registration details

4/05/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 103
Arrowtown
9351
93 Arrowtown-Lake Hayes Road
Lake Hayes
9371

Charity's other details

+64274242503


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Hugo Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hugo Charitable Trust
Hugo Charitable Trust Limited
Hugo Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Every charitable purpose, whether the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion, or any other matter beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, People with disabilities

Other charities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'Hugo Charitable Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'Hugo Charitable Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'Hugo Charitable Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'Hugo Charitable Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 Member of 'Hugo Charitable Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 12/05/2020 $4,239,985 $4,649,590 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 3/05/2019 $3,687,045 $3,500,488 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/04/2018 $78,267,105 $3,007,125 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kerry Deanne Ludlam Accounts Administrator 1/05/2018
Kathryn Mary Roberts Trustee 1/06/2017
Mark Andrew Owens Trustee 1/06/2017
Robert Bruce Stewart QC Trustee 1/06/2017
Aoibheann Anne Monaghan Trustee and CEO 4/05/2017
Maryanne Green Founder 4/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kerry John Ludlam Chief Financial Officer 29/04/2022
Kayleigh Rose Catherine Alice Blythen Donations Officer 30/07/2021
Julia Anne Hunter Donations Manager - North Island 31/07/2020
Stephen Matthew Hunter Trustee 30/06/2020
Alice Jane Watson Trustee 31/05/2017
Maryanne Green Trustee 31/05/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/09/2022 NOC018
30/03/2021 NOC017
26/01/2021 NOC016
25/01/2021 NOC015
17/08/2020 NOC014
4/08/2020 NOC013
2/07/2020 NOC012
12/05/2020 NOC010
1/05/2018 NOC008
22/08/2017 NOC006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.