Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hugo Limited
CC56942
9429046173270
Registered

Registration details

11/09/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 103
Arrowtown
9351
93 Arrowtown-Lake Hayes Road
RD 1
Lake Hayes
Queenstown
9371

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Hugo Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hugo Charitable Trust
Hugo Charitable Trust Limited
Hugo Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Every charitable purpose, whether the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion, or any other matter beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Religious activities

Other charities

General public

Legal Structure


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aoibheann Anne Monaghan Director 22/12/2020
Bruce Stewart QC Director 10/09/2019
Kathryn Roberts Director 10/09/2019
Mark Owens Director 10/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Hunter Director 30/06/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/03/2021 NOC005
26/01/2021 NOC004
25/01/2021 NOC003
2/07/2020 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.