Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Atiawa Nui Tonu Fisheries Limited
Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust

Group Details


Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
3/06/2010
CC44325
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 4046
Marewa
Napier
4143
9 Park Road
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Group's other details

022 153 6898


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2024 31/03/2025 2/04/2025 $620,227 $252,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2023 31/03/2024 5/02/2024 $719,341 $253,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2022 31/03/2023 22/03/2023 $460,302 $141,214 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2021 31/03/2022 16/06/2022 $459,558 $165,242 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2020 31/03/2021 1/04/2021 $385,428 $77,304 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2019 31/03/2020 30/03/2020 $378,362 $94,349 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2018 31/03/2019 13/03/2019 $353,630 $102,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2017 31/03/2018 5/03/2018 $334,037 $122,465 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2016 31/03/2017 3/02/2018 $349,026 $107,255 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2015 31/03/2016 21/02/2016 $355,959 $144,165 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To receive,hold, manage and administer the Trust fund for every charitable purpose benefitting Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui whether it relates to the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion or any other matters beneficial to the community of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika a Maui and all members of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui irrespective of where those members reside and for every Charitable purpose benefitting a. Maori who are not members of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a maui; and b. Members of the community generally

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Grants to Marae

Marae on reservation land

Environment / conservation, Care / protection of animals, Fisheries

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Other charities, Marae

Entity Structure

The parent Trust comprises six elected Trustees, with two Trustees being elected by each of the three main marae of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui, those marae being Pipitea Marae, Te Tatau o Te Po Marae and Waiwhetu Marae. The wholly owned subsidiary company, Atiawa Nui Tonu Fisheries Limited, is governed by three directors, one of whom must also be a Trustee of the parent Trust

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/02/2015 NOC003
18/02/2011 AR002

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.