Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Atiawa Nui Tonu Fisheries Limited
CC44324
9429034220634
Registered

Registration details

3/06/2010
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 4046
Marewa
Napier
4143
9 Park Road
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

04 477 0659


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Atiawa Nui Tonu Fisheries Limited
Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To receive, hold, and manage for so long at they are retained, the Settlement Quota and Income shares under the Maori Fisheries Act 2004 for the benefit of the charitable purposes of the Trust, such purposes to be promoted by the payment of dividend or other revenue or capital distributions to the Trust

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Other (please state)

(Lease of commercial fishing quota and management of funds for the parent Trust)

Other (please state)

(Maori descendants of Te Atiawa Poneke)

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Renee Detheiry Randall Director 4/02/2024
Peter John Anaru Reweti Director 12/12/2019
Toa Woodbine Pomare Director 12/04/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lee John Ruka Hunter Director 30/09/2023
Morris Te Whiti Love Director 31/03/2020
Wirangi Awhio Luke Director 12/12/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/09/2020 NOC005

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.