Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Hopai Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Hopai Home & Hospital Limited
Te Hopai Trust Board

Group Details


Te Hopai Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC40547
March 31

Address for service

51 Hospital Road
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Group's other details

043802002


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 4/09/2024 $15,478,392 $13,731,335 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 9/08/2023 $14,016,142 $12,839,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/08/2022 $13,240,695 $12,070,151 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 5/08/2021 $12,488,892 $11,438,128 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 6/08/2020 $11,551,755 $10,840,151 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 16/08/2019 $11,008,791 $10,413,978 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 19/08/2019 $10,106,731 $9,690,084 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $9,631,354 $8,917,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 20/09/2016 $9,205,710 $8,816,828 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Care for the aged and needy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Care services

Health

Accommodation / housing, Social services, Disability

Older people

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Provision of aged care through Te Hopai Home & Hospital.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.