Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Hopai Home & Hospital Limited
CC40543
9429039085658
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Hopai Home Limited 30/06/2008
Te Hopai Home & Hospital Limited 14/07/2014

Address for service

51 Hospital Road
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

043802002


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Hopai Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Hopai Home & Hospital Limited
Te Hopai Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Care for the aged and needy

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Accommodation / housing, Social services, People with disabilities

Older people

People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Helen Davison Director 6/11/2024
Denise Frances Church Director 6/11/2024
Simon Nicholas Wallace Director 6/11/2024
Angelique Jane Jackson Director 3/08/2022
Cheryl Anne Goodyer Director 3/08/2022
Michael John Beresford Smith Director 3/08/2022
Andrea Meredyth McCance Director 5/08/2020
David Mark Rowe Director 5/12/2007
Dean Stafford James Riddell Director 1/04/2002
Masako Horiuchi Crawford Director 16/10/1996
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Renee Sara Director 7/08/2024
Mary Schumacher Director 7/02/2024
Lorraine Christie Director 7/12/2022
Rory Matthews Director 2/09/2022
David Alexander Stewart Director 3/08/2022
Euan Lindsay Taylor Wright Director 5/08/2020
James McGuinness Trustee 5/08/2020
Suzanne Patricia Ellis Director 5/08/2020
Alison Bowie Director 5/09/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/09/2024 NOC018
3/09/2022 NOC015
2/11/2017 NOC009
27/10/2017 NOC008
24/12/2014 NOC004
23/11/2012 NOC001
29/09/2010 AR003
1/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.