Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Medical Securities Limited
MAS
CC57173
N/A
Registered

Registration details

1/12/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 957
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
10 Waterloo Quay
Pipitea
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800 800 627


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of MAS Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
MAS Foundation
Medical Assurance Society New Zealand Limited
Medical Funds Management Limited
Medical Insurance Society Limited
Medical Life Assurance Society Limited
Medical Mortgages Limited
Medical Securities Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote health in New Zealand by supporting health research, education and promotion. A full statement of MSL's charitable purpose is included in paragraph 2.2 of the attached constitution.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Doug Hill Director 27/09/2023
Brett Sutton Director 29/02/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Harley Aish Chairman 30/08/2023
Martin Stokes Director 20/03/2023
Alastair Hercus Director 29/02/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/10/2023 NOC008
16/10/2023 NOC007
31/03/2023 NOC005
31/03/2023 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.