Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The University of Waikato Foundation
CC29545
9429042890058
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The University Of Waikato Foundation 30/06/2008
The University of Waikato Foundation 29/06/2009

Address for service

Private Bag 3105
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
Development Office
University of Waikato, Gate 5
Hillcrest
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 838 4446


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of University of Waikato Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
iEngagEd Limited
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
The University of Waikato Foundation
The University Of Waikato Research Trust
University Of Waikato

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide fundraising services for the benefit of the University of Waikato and for the promotion of education in its widest sense.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Raise funds to support University of Waikato)

Fund-raising

Promote tertiary education.

Children / young people

University of Waikato, its teaching and research activities, its students and the broader community that benefits from its economic impact in the region and work to expand knowledge

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act
University Of Waikato

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'University of Waikato Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 18/06/2024 $3,533,993 $63,775 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 20/06/2023 $1,764,684 $1,716,610 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2022 $4,561,952 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 25/06/2021 $1,746,833 $74,673 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 18/06/2020 $2,204,198 $19,008 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 27/05/2019 $1,786,656 $17,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 18/06/2018 $2,487,002 $16,611 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 22/06/2017 $2,516,527 $15,051 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $1,603,385 $11,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kevin Lester Bowler Trustee 3/10/2023
Dr Andrew Smith Chair 1/01/2022
Sir Paul Adams Trustee 19/04/2021
Susan Hassall Trustee 29/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Crawford Chairman 31/12/2021
Ken Williamson Trustee 31/12/2020
Jennifer Scoular Trustee 7/03/2019
Jim Bolger Trustee 31/12/2018
Neil Quigley Trustee 2/12/2018
Michael Jackson Trustee 23/11/2018
John Matheson TRUSTEE 22/11/2018
Kerst Stelwagen Trustee 3/11/2018
Glen Hughes TRUSTEE 7/06/2018
Patrick Edward Peoples Trustee 13/12/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/07/2024 NOC042
15/04/2024 NOC040
15/04/2024 NOC039
10/03/2022 NOC035
7/03/2022 NOC034
21/04/2021 NOC032
20/04/2021 NOC031
27/05/2019 NOC028
3/04/2019 NOC027
26/03/2019 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.