Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
CC31589
9429042955245
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

C/- UNIVERSITY WAIKATO Private Bag 3105
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
C/- UNIVERSITY WAIKATO
5 Hillcrest Road
Hillcrest
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 8379718


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of University of Waikato Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
iEngagEd Limited
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
The University of Waikato Foundation
The University Of Waikato Research Trust
University Of Waikato

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To finance existing and new building facilities on the UoW campus for the use of the members of the WSU.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research

Children / young people

University Students

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act
University Of Waikato

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'University of Waikato Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/06/2024 $248,427 $2,885 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 10/05/2023 $216,906 $2,650,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 20/06/2022 $212,079 $16,967 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 27/05/2021 $233,120 $2,749 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 18/06/2020 $267,496 $2,462 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 21/05/2019 $267,488 $2,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 11/06/2018 $279,884 $2,115 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 21/06/2017 $240,001 $2,632 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $258,966 $34,398 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mira Arif Trustee 18/06/2024
Temple Smith Trustee 18/06/2024
Zheng Liu Trustee 18/06/2024
Brandon McGibbon Trustee 1/01/2024
Brett McEwan Trustee 1/01/2024
James Frank Eric Mercer Trustee 1/01/2020
Neil Clayton Quigley Trustee 9/02/2015
David John West Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alister Jones Trustee 31/12/2023
Kyea Bonita-Miriama Watene-Hakaria Trustee 31/12/2023
Lushomo Thebe Trustee 31/12/2023
Michael William James Calvert Trustee 31/12/2023
Stella McLean Trustee 31/12/2023
Mahia Nicole Smith Trustee 3/05/2023
Areta Ranginui- Charlton Trustee 26/04/2022
Kyla Campbell-Kamariera Trustee 26/04/2022
Nelson Daniel Cooper Truste 31/12/2020
Tyler Hiriwa Te Kiri Trustee 31/12/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/06/2024 NOC024
26/03/2021 NOC020
26/03/2021 NOC019
10/03/2021 NOC018
16/03/2020 NOC016
14/02/2020 NOC015
23/05/2019 NOC014
16/10/2017 NOC011
28/06/2016 NOC009
24/04/2015 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.