Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Mercy Ministries Limited
CC31584
9429036626274
Deregistered
31/03/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Mercy Ministries Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/03/2024 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Member of the Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand Trust group.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The company is managed by the board which consists of 3 directors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Patricia Rowe Director 30/06/2008
Susan France Director 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Francis Horton Tuck Director 15/04/2020
Reuben O'Neill Director 9/10/2015
Anne Pauline Campbell Director 6/10/2015
Denise Margaret Fox Director 19/02/2010
Rita Joan Vessey Director 9/02/2010
Pauline Francis Engel Director 31/07/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2020 NOC009
25/02/2010 NOC003
10/09/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.