Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Age Concern Napier Incorporated
CC20706
9429042576228
Registered

Registration details

27/01/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4027
Marewa
Napier
4143
98 Taradale Road
Onekawa
Napier
4110

Charity's other details

(06)8421346


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Age Concern Hawkes Bay Regional. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Age Concern (Flaxmere) Incorporated
Age Concern Havelock North Incorporated
Age Concern Napier Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Age Concern Napier works to enhance the wellbeing of older people by providing a range of services, information and support. The aim is to enable older people to remain independent for as long as possible, living in their own homes as part of their local community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/10/2024 $631,099 $462,124 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 16/10/2023 $380,490 $327,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 28/10/2022 $253,062 $243,899 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 3/08/2021 $254,665 $249,045 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 19/11/2020 $166,217 $159,608 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $168,594 $187,547 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 13/08/2018 $136,398 $187,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 14/09/2017 $146,304 $163,070 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 7/07/2016 $167,596 $163,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Simmonds Board of Governance 25/07/2024
Georgina Pearce Board of Governance 11/08/2022
Gregory Mawson board of governance member 11/08/2022
Kevin O'Brien President 29/07/2021
Valerie Dale Board of Governance Member 29/07/2021
Morag Hill Treasurer Staff appointed 1/09/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony Simmonds Board of Governance 12/10/2023
Nigel Dawes Board of Governance 6/09/2022
Leslie Hewett Vice President 11/08/2022
David Booth Board of Governnce 30/11/2021
Annette Boyd Secretary 29/07/2021
Eleanor Mahony board of governance member 29/07/2021
Janet Smith President 29/07/2021
Margaret Workman board of governance member 29/07/2021
Gail Mulvey President 31/03/2021
Maxine Boag Board of Governance 10/02/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/10/2022 NOC028
3/08/2021 NOC026
12/02/2020 NOC023
1/04/2019 NOC020
5/04/2018 NOC018
20/07/2016 NOC016
23/09/2015 NOC014
3/07/2014 NOC013
3/07/2014 NOC012
16/05/2014 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.