Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Family Success Matters Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Family Success Matters
Fathers for Families Foundation

Group Details


Family Success Matters Group

Registration details

Registered
24/10/2023
CC61712
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 76185
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
1 Ash Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Group's other details

(09)2520197
(09)2694671


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/12/2024 $6,832,825 $7,475,805 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/01/2024 4/01/2024 $5,623,614 $5,635,391 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To improve the health, education and welfare of families and children; to contribute to creating safer environments for children and communities; and to improve the outcomes for families over the long term by providing early intervention and improving intergenerational parenting by breaking the cycle of violence and abuse.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Employment

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

We are based in Manukau, Auckland. The two organisations in the group are separately registered charities that share different floors of the same building. FSM offers the Family Start Programme and Fathers for Families Foundation offers a Fathers Programme and Support.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.