Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Fathers for Families Foundation
CC60316
9429050606351
Registered

Registration details

22/07/2022
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 76185
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
1 Ash Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

Fathers for Families


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Family Success Matters Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Family Success Matters
Fathers for Families Foundation

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Give men strength and resilience to become better fathers and partners by building self-esteem and creating purpose through implementation and promotion of the tools of the Fathers for Families programme developed by Family Success Matters. Improve intergenerational parenting. Create safer environments for children and communities. Improve health, education and welfare of families and children. Provide early intervention to improve outcomes for families and help children attain their potential.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research

Family / whanau

men

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Family Success Matters Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Malcolm David Jack Trustee 16/02/2024
Anthony Stephen Tumai Trustee 19/05/2022
Colleen Caryll Fakalogotoa CEO 19/05/2022
Roine Lealaiauloto Trustee 19/05/2022
Ruth Margaret Sinclair Trustee 19/05/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Niko Mikaele Toluono Trustee 28/03/2025
Perofeta Enosa Auva'a Trustee 29/05/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/05/2025 NOC009
10/07/2024 NOC006
10/10/2023 NOC002
18/08/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.