Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Hospice North Shore Trusts.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harbour Hospice Development Foundation
Harbour Hospice Trust

Group Details


Hospice North Shore Trusts
Harbour Hospice

Registration details

Registered
8/03/2017
CC54258
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 331129
Takapuna
Auckland
740
7 Shea Terrace
Takapuna
Auckland
622

Group's other details

(09)4861688
(09)4861230


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This group has filed the annual return for the year ending 30 June 2016 under the parent charity, North Shore Hospice Trust (CC22413).

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 28/11/2024 $23,642,102 $25,031,938 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/11/2023 $21,616,585 $22,504,119 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 15/12/2022 $19,568,094 $19,612,920 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 16/12/2021 $20,793,948 $18,909,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 17/12/2020 $20,615,934 $17,776,173 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $19,013,066 $19,522,135 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 21/12/2018 $14,869,689 $13,007,254 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 9/01/2018 $14,300,353 $12,038,768 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide free specialist hospice and palliative care for people and families in our local communities. To provide skilled and compassionate holistic care during illness and ongoing bereavement care to families after death. To support health professional colleagues through training and advisory services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Other charities

Entity Structure

Hospice North Shore Trusts consists of the Harbour Hospice Trust which is the service's operating entity. This trust includes three hospices: Hospice North Shore, Hibiscus Coast and Warkworth Wellsford Hospice. The Harbour Hospice Development Foundation supports ongoing operational and capital requirements through prudent investment and management of bequests. Hospice services are funded through DHB contracts, diverse fundraising programmes and a 'chain' of second hand stores.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.