Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Harbour Hospice Development Foundation
CC22411
9429042939214
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 331129
Takapuna
Auckland
740
7 Shea Terrace
Takapuna
Auckland
622

Charity's other details

(09)4861688
(09)4861230


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Hospice North Shore Trusts. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harbour Hospice Development Foundation
Harbour Hospice Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide free specialist hospice and palliative care for people and families in our local communities. To provide skilled and compassionate holistic care during illness and ongoing bereavement care to families after death. To support health professional colleagues through training and advisory services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Palliative Care

Health

Education / training / research, Palliative Care

General public

Other charities, Terminally Ill

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009. This charity has consolidated its financials from the year ending 30 June 2016 with its parent, the North Shore Hospice Trust (CC22413).

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Katie Anne Noble Trustee 20/11/2023
Kirsty Madeleine Louise Vercoe Trustee 20/11/2023
Lou-Ann Janelle Ballantyne Trustee 20/11/2023
Natasha Tanya Geo Trustee 20/11/2023
Peter Changoh Yoo Trustee 20/11/2023
Suzanne Carol Lasenby Trustee 20/11/2023
Gillian Eugene Roebuck Cossey Trustee 28/06/2018
Carmel Laura Conaghan Trustee 10/07/2017
Margaret Ann Tod Chair 10/04/2017
Kerry Francis Deputy Chair 4/07/2016
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Desmond Hamilton Adams Trustee 20/11/2023
James Grigor Trustee 20/11/2023
Kenneth Roydon Noble Trustee 20/11/2023
Wilfred Marley Trustee 20/11/2023
Stephanie Paxton-Penman Trustee 27/02/2023
Paul James Baldwin Trustee 9/11/2020
Kenneth Roydon Noble Trustee 9/12/2019
William Richard Grieve Trustee 11/11/2019
Ken Noble Trustee 11/02/2019
Darryl Soljan Trustee 30/06/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2023 NOC032
12/06/2023 NOC030
21/12/2020 NOC027
20/12/2019 NOC025
20/12/2019 NOC023
11/07/2018 NOC022
4/07/2018 NOC019
10/11/2017 NOC016
4/10/2016 NOC013
22/09/2016 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.