Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Pou Matakana Tuararo Limited
CC39141
9429038450464
Registered

Registration details

2/02/2009
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Learning Post Limited 2/02/2009
Te Pou Matakana Tuarara Limited 13/03/2014

Address for service

PO Box 21081
Henderson
Auckland
650
6 Pioneer Street
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

09 836 6683
09 8384314


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide back office services to the West Auckland community providers

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Education and training

Other (please state)

(Back office services)

Other charities

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Moyna Grace Director 8/12/2014
Raymond Hall Director 8/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Henry Tamihere Director 7/12/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/08/2022 NOC013
18/12/2014 NOC005
13/03/2014 NOC004
13/03/2014 NOC003
15/10/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31646) on 27 May 2025. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 30 June 2024 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31646.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.