Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whanau Tahi Limited
CC31651
9429038983368
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Waipareira Financial Services Limited 30/06/2008
Whanau Tahi Limited 3/10/2011

Address for service

PO Box 21081
Henderson
Auckland
650
13 Edsel Street
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

(09)8366683
(09)8384314

Oceania

Australia

North America

United States


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide services to the West Auckland community in IT and consultaing

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(IT and consulting)

Other (please state)

(IT and consulting)

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Leon Wijohn Chair 14/03/2022
John Henry Tamihere Director 28/11/2019
Raymond Paul Noonan Director 29/03/2017
Raymond Hall Director 8/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Aubrey Keung Director 2/08/2022
Evelyn Taumaunu Director 14/03/2022
Ngaire Te Hira Director 20/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/08/2022 NOC017
31/03/2022 NOC015
15/03/2022 NOC014
15/03/2022 NOC013
21/06/2018 NOC008
31/03/2017 NOC006
18/12/2014 NOC004
25/11/2014 NOC002
14/03/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31646) on 27 May 2025. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 30 June 2024 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31646.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.