Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Te Ngākau Waiora Mercy Centre Limited
CC31608
9429037426125
Deregistered
21/03/2023

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Te Ngākau Waiora Mercy Centre Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 21/03/2023 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Ngakau Waiora Mercy Centre Limited 30/06/2008
Te Ngākau Waiora Mercy Centre Limited 28/06/2019

Address for service

P O Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Ponsonby
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is to create a place for learning and for a deeper relationship with God, fostering the inner search for personal, social and spiritual renewal. With its spacious, well established grounds, mature trees and gardens and organic gardening practices, the Centre also reflects a commitment to care of the Earth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Religious activities, Education, Training

General public

Entity Structure

The company is managed by the board which consists of 2 directors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Melville (Doc) Owen Godfrey Director 10/09/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Laurance Buckland Director 18/07/2021
Donna Lorraine Peterson Director 15/07/2020
Joan Winifred Fogarty Director 15/07/2020
Lynn Marie Lander Director 15/07/2020
Mary Frances Catherwood Director 15/07/2020
Noel Ronald Letford Director 15/07/2020
David Raymond Crawley Director 31/05/2017
Linda Megan Mcquade Director 31/05/2017
Cathryn Sarah Wiles - Pickard Director 21/09/2015
Louise Constance Campbell Director 21/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2022 NOC014
7/10/2020 NOC012
7/10/2020 NOC011
28/06/2019 NOC008
27/09/2017 NOC006
26/09/2017 NOC004
17/02/2016 NOC002
21/09/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.