Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Aotea Island Playcentre
Aotea Playcentre
CC41998
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
August 31

Address for service

44 Kaitoke Lane
RD 1
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island)
Great Barrier Island
0991

Charity's other details

09 4290600
https://www.facebook.com/AoteaPlaycentre


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Playcentre Aotearoa. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Alicetown Playcentre
Aorere Playcentre
Aotea Island Playcentre
Apiti Playcentre
Aramoho Playcentre
Aria Playcentre
Arohena Playcentre
Ashburton Playcentre
Ashhurst Playcentre
Te Whānau Tupu Ngātahi o Aotearoa - Playcentre Aotearoa
1 2345678910>
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Playcentre philosophy and practice are based on "Whanau Tupu Ngatahi - Families Growing Together". Playcentre recognises parents as the first and most important educators of their children and supports them to educate their children. Playcentre provides quality early childhood educational sessions for young children (birth to school age) through quality play experiences supported by a high child to adult ratio. Adults participate in the Playcentre Education Programme which supports children's learning & growth through their Playcentre journey & beyond. Playcentre is a family organisation where - we empower adults and children to play, work, learn & grow together. Each Playcentre is a cooperative. Parents decide how their centre will run and are responsible for the education of their children. Parents also make decisions giving direction to how Playcentre Aotearoa (national body) will run.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 February 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28 February 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2024 28/02/2025 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2023 29/02/2024 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2022 28/02/2023 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2021 28/02/2022 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2020 28/02/2021 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2019 29/02/2020 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2018 28/02/2019 Member of 'Playcentre Aotearoa' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/08/2017 28/02/2018 1/03/2018 $39,414 $54,420 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2016 28/02/2017 26/02/2017 $69,313 $31,368 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2015 29/02/2016 5/04/2016 $44,632 $48,832 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
1 2>
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna McGoram Session Facilitator 1/09/2024
Rebecca Hawkins Centre Advisor/Signatory 9/03/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nichole Lill Centre Signatory 31/10/2024
Kathryn Sutherland Centre Treasurer 31/08/2024
Chloe Johnstone Centre Signatory 31/08/2023
Bethan Christine Park Officeholder/Signatory 4/05/2023
Mallory Thompson Officeholder/Signatory 4/05/2023
Shanti Morgan Treasurer 1/12/2022
Lindsay Schauer Officeholder 24/10/2022
Bethan Park Secretary 2/10/2022
Mallory Thompson President 2/10/2022
Edwin Sutherland Treasurer 30/03/2021
1 23>
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/11/2024 NOC032
8/03/2024 NOC031
27/11/2023 NOC030
25/05/2023 NOC029
25/05/2023 NOC028
24/03/2023 NOC027
14/12/2022 NOC026
1/12/2022 NOC025
29/11/2022 NOC024
22/11/2022 NOC023
1 23>
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC41988) on 28 March 2018.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.