pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Taranaki Ostomy Society
CC34502
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 853
Taranaki Mail Centre
New Plymouth
4340

Charity's other details

0272119566
Facebook icon image
Taranaki Ostomy Society


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Taranaki Ostomy Society is a non-profit organisation which aims to assist in the rehabilitation of people who have undergone bowel or bladder surgery, resulting in a colostomy, ileostomy, urostomy or appendicostomy. the society also caters for people with non-surgical cases of inflammatory bowel disease and irritable bowel syndrome. It is often the first link with a group of people who help one another and to find strength in the knowledge that they are not alone, that their experiences are not unique and there are answers to their questions and problems.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Social services, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The society is managed by an committee of volunteers comprising a President, Treasurer, Secretary, Newsletter Editor and several ordinary committee members, depending on demand. Meetings are held bi-monthly. Society membership is by annual subscription. A Conference Planning Committee is formed to plan for a Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies National Conference when it is held in Taranaki.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $2,184 $1,063
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $2,834 $5,462
30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $3,811 $5,852
30/09/2018 26/08/2018 $13,941 $7,642
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $5,873 $5,252
30/09/2016 3/10/2016 $2,836 $2,881
30/09/2015 3/09/2015 $2,209 $3,792
30/09/2014 9/10/2014 $3,457 $2,679
30/09/2013 3/12/2013 $2,852 $2,239
30/09/2012 31/07/2012 $2,145 $2,285

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bernie Christian Co-Chairperson 30/05/2021
Raewyn Anne Rooney Co-Chairperson 28/05/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alex John McDougall Treasurer 8/11/2021
Shelley-Anne McDougall Immediate Past President 8/11/2021
Frances Doreen Butler Committee Member 30/05/2021
Keith Roy Sampson Committee Member 30/05/2021
Lynda Anne Kuriger Vice President 30/05/2021
Elizabeth Jane Tobin Secretary 10/08/2020
Lisa Maree Grigg Treasurer 9/08/2019
Neville Ian Morris Committee member 9/08/2019
Robyn Lesley Gall Immediate Past President 9/08/2019
William Thomson Cramond Gilkison Patron 9/08/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/11/2021 NOC026
29/09/2021 NOC024
26/09/2019 NOC021
15/08/2019 NOC020
2/11/2018 NOC019
7/07/2017 NOC015
9/05/2017 NOC014
9/05/2017 NOC013
12/01/2017 NOC012
15/09/2016 NOC010

Charity Documents