pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Ostomy New Zealand
CC29272
9429042713098
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

98 Highcliff Road
Andersons Bay
Dunedin
9013

Charity's other details

0274774137


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To work together with families, all medical professionals, and local authorities to ensure Ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and culture in New Zealand receive free of charge, the best care and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Persons of all ages

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society governed by an Executive Council of up to eight volunteers elected from the member societies.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 7/10/2021 $62,700 $31,029
30/09/2020 25/04/2021 $53,352 $65,477
30/09/2019 20/08/2019 $49,199 $55,638
30/09/2018 26/08/2018 $61,758 $62,076
30/09/2017 25/07/2017 $56,427 $56,965
30/09/2016 31/08/2016 $45,695 $50,613
30/09/2015 22/09/2015 $10,243 $10,699
30/09/2014 10/08/2014 $10,505 $12,675
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $11,033 $11,410
30/09/2012 29/09/2012 $11,959 $11,945

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brent Richard Silcock Committee 8/08/2021
David Christopher Barnes Committee 8/08/2021
Brent Hamlin Treasurer 25/09/2020
Robyn Olive Tourell Secretary 11/08/2019
Kallia Patching President 6/08/2017
Janet Lynn Haines Vice President 16/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jill Annette Newton President 8/08/2021
Richard Bruce McNair Treasurer 30/11/2020
Shelley-Anne McDougall Vice President 25/09/2020
Brent Richard Silcock Committee 11/08/2019
David Christopher Barnes Vice President 11/08/2019
Lee King Secretary 11/08/2019
Robyn Gall Treasurer 11/08/2019
Karl Robert Moen Committee 4/08/2018
Barry John Maughan Treasurer 6/08/2017
Geoffrey James Booth Committee 6/08/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/10/2021 NOC032
25/04/2021 NOC031
25/09/2020 NOC029
30/08/2019 NOC028
1/04/2018 NOC025
5/08/2017 NOC023
26/09/2016 NOC021
21/08/2016 NOC019
10/05/2016 NOC018
9/05/2016 NOC017

Charity Documents