pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


North Harbour Ostomy Society
NHOS
CC29298
9429042689270
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 34684
Birkenhead
Auckland
0746

Charity's other details

0210444067


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To work together with families, all medical professionals and local authorities to ensure Ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and culture in New Zealand receive free of charge, the best care and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

North Harbour Ostomy Society (Inc) is affiliated to the Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies. It has a volunteer committee of up to eight volunteers, elected at the AGM. President, Vice-President, Treasurer, secretary and four other members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2021 23/02/2021 $914 $738
31/03/2020 16/08/2020 $863 $1,638
31/03/2019 18/03/2019 $833 $980
31/03/2018 23/02/2018 $1,351 $871
31/03/2017 24/02/2017 $1,909 $844
31/03/2016 5/05/2016 $1,296 $1,559
31/03/2015 5/12/2014 $2,524 $1,245
31/03/2014 5/12/2014 $2,537 $1,614
31/03/2013 5/12/2014 $1,903 $1,449

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mandy Little Secretary/Temp Treasurer 24/11/2012
Douglas Laughlan President 28/11/2006
Judith Fay Marie Smith Committee Member 28/11/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Eleanor Lillian Thomson Committee Member 23/11/2018
Stuart Ross Treasurer 16/02/2018
Anthony Philip Stanaway Vice President 23/11/2013
David Alfred Haines President 23/11/2013
Thomas Joseph Doyle Committee Member 30/06/2012
Noel Alexander Ian Leslie Committee Member 4/12/2011
James Frederick Walsh Committee Member 31/10/2008
Janet Maralyn Davis Treasurer/ Secretary 31/10/2008
Jim Dufficy Committee 31/10/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/10/2019 NOC011
11/03/2017 NOC008
26/02/2017 NOC007
5/06/2015 NOC005
5/02/2015 NOC004
19/10/2012 AR004
29/04/2011 AR003
31/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents