pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Manawatu Ostomy Society
CC34487
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

Unit 26
My Life Villas
Kelvin Grove
Palmerston North
4414

Charity's other details

063575799


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

provide support and advice to potential and existing ostomates, education and welfare interests of ostomates.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provide fellowship for Ostomates), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, Social services, Advance Interests and Welfare of Ostomates / Education

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Members of manawatu ostomy society elect a management committee which includes a chair, secretary, treasurer and a comittee of 6 members.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Federation Of NZ Ostomy Societies Inc (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 12/08/2020 $1,126 $1,361
30/09/2019 15/05/2019 $1,354 $1,465
30/09/2018 21/05/2018 $1,561 $1,559
30/09/2017 14/09/2017 $1,336 $1,592
30/09/2016 11/01/2017 $903 $1,254
30/09/2015 17/08/2015 $1,732 $948
30/09/2014 18/11/2016 $1,216 $1,293
30/09/2013 30/07/2013 $1,213 $2,552
30/09/2012 10/08/2012 $1,247 $781

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Judith Collett Secretary 3/05/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Barbara Lesley McDonald Treasurer 31/03/2020
Marj Whiting President 7/05/2016
Shaun Mccarthy Vice President 21/10/2014
Susan Gail Steer Secretary / Treasurer 10/03/2014
Liz Baxter Editor 28/02/2010
David Palmer Vice President 20/02/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/12/2020 NOC016
17/04/2017 NOC010
17/04/2017 NOC009
30/07/2013 AR006
19/07/2010 AR003

Charity Documents