pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
CC42319
9429043200696
Registered

Registration details

17/09/2009
February 28

Address for service

17 Saxbys Road
Glenview
Hamilton
3206

Charity's other details

0212455064


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide peer support for ostomates, before and after surgery, and to promote their general welfare

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, Social services, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Members elect a committee, which includes President, Treasurer and Secretary and up to seven committee members

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 August 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 August 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2021 20/05/2021 $2,813 $1,808
31/08/2020 13/04/2020 $27,069 $25,226
31/08/2019 1/06/2019 $10,377 $2,678
31/08/2018 5/08/2018 $2,820 $1,873
31/08/2017 5/06/2017 $2,725 $2,498
31/08/2016 18/05/2016 $2,645 $3,646
31/08/2015 15/04/2015 $2,783 $2,944
31/08/2014 8/04/2014 $2,756 $2,919
31/08/2013 18/03/2013 $3,106 $3,127
31/08/2012 16/04/2012 $1,336 $3,270

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Barry Maughan Committee 25/03/2018
Brian Gordon Committee 26/03/2017
Joanne Laurie Committee 26/03/2017
Michael Sumner Treasurer / Acting President 25/03/2012
Helena Anderson Committee 21/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Beverly Rose Turner Committee 25/03/2018
Bruce Turner Committee 25/03/2018
Patricia Rogers committee 25/03/2018
Philip John Rogers Committee 25/03/2018
Annette Ireland committee 26/03/2017
Shereen Broderson Secretary 26/03/2017
Jo-anne Olive Laurie Committee 28/02/2016
Les Evitts Treasurer 30/03/2014
Ann Jarkjewicz Committee 25/03/2012
Eileen Carmen Evitts Committee member 25/03/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/06/2018 NOC008
11/06/2017 NOC007
13/05/2016 NOC005
31/03/2014 NOC004
16/04/2012 AR004
27/08/2010 AR002

Charity Documents