pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
CC34497
9429042794783
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

98 Highcliff Road
Andersons Bay
Dunedin
9013

Charity's other details

0274774137


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide on going support and information for people who have had or are going to have surgery on their Bowel or Bladder that results in a Ostomy being preformed. To work together with families, all medical professionals, and local health authorities, to ensure Ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and culture in New Zealand and culture in New Zealand and within our region, receive, free of charge, the best care, and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Fellow Ostomates

Entity Structure

Members elect a Committee at AGM of President, Vice President, Secretary, Treasurer and up to 8 Committee Members to organise activities and meetings for year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 15/04/2021 $2,012 $2,459
30/09/2020 15/04/2021 $5,160 $5,021
30/09/2019 10/05/2019 $2,170 $2,384
30/09/2018 11/06/2018 $1,686 $3,065
30/09/2017 3/07/2017 $1,568 $1,861
30/09/2016 15/08/2016 $1,734 $3,713
30/09/2015 15/07/2015 $1,837 $2,979
30/09/2014 17/07/2014 $7,462 $2,024
30/09/2013 16/07/2013 $2,558 $2,359
30/09/2012 24/08/2012 $4,746 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lois Colleen Peat Committee Member 22/06/2019
George Dawson Murphy Committee Member 2/05/2015
Lindsay Bryant Vice President 2/05/2015
Philip Elliot President 2/05/2015
Robyn Tourel Treasurer 12/06/2010
Elaine Margaret Dasler Committee - Life Member 30/06/2008
Fergus Meehan Secretary 16/06/2007
Elaine Nelson Committee Member 13/06/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Martin Sinclair Hair Committee Member 22/06/2019
Heather Georgina Keen Treasurer 27/01/2018
Linda Smillie Committee Member 27/05/2017
Norma Joyce Bethune Newsletter Editor 27/05/2017
Gregory Martin Scott Committee member 1/11/2015
Lindsay Bryant Committee member 2/05/2015
George Dawson Murphy President 1/05/2015
Philip Keith Elliot Vice president 1/05/2015
John Howard Moss Committee member 31/05/2014
Sharron Jeanette Mayfield Committee Member 8/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/04/2020 NOC019
22/04/2020 NOC018
8/11/2015 NOC010
17/07/2015 NOC009
6/07/2015 NOC008
4/07/2014 NOC007
10/07/2013 NOC003
24/08/2012 AR005
9/08/2010 AR003
31/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents