Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Suzanne Aubert Compassion Centre Wellington Limited
Compassion Centre Soup Kitchen
CC10140
9429038296222
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1474
Wellington
6140
132-142 Tory Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 282 1962


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Sisters of Compassion Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Compassion Housing Limited
Our Lady's Home of Compassion Island Bay Limited
Saint Joseph's Home of Compassion Heretaunga Limited
Sisters of Compassion Group Limited
Suzanne Aubert Compassion Centre Wellington Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

"To support people in need to live with dignity in the community We seek to provide support to people in need, which includes those who are marginalised through such things as mental health issues, addictions, homelessness and poverty. We also seek to provide support to people in need because of social isolation, limited social skills, limited education, and in times of crisis. We seek to provide services in a way that is respectful and honours the dignity of the individual and encourages growth and development. We seek to build community, celebrate the Soup Kitchen community and promote access to services, participation in the wider community and engagement in meaningful and productive activities. Compassion Soup Kitchen provides breakfast and dinner 6 days a week (Mon-Sat) The Soup Kitchen is often the first point of entry to services for those on the margins. There are few barriers to accessing the meal service at the Soup Kitchen, so it’s a good place to connect with people.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Health, Community development, Promotion of volunteering, Soup Kitchen

People with disabilities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Soup Kitchen is a registered Company with a Manager reporting to a Board
Sisters of Compassion Group Limited

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2024 Member of 'Sisters of Compassion Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 29/01/2023 $667,924 $643,775 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2021 $605,240 $633,207 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/11/2020 $728,842 $715,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $649,678 $638,393 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 2/10/2018 $658,428 $660,872 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 2/05/2018 $742,216 $730,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $726,814 $709,694 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 12/01/2016 $669,878 $686,689 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nigel Arthur Prince Director 12/09/2023
Alisi Paea 'i Vaiola Tu'iPulotu Director 16/08/2023
Deirdre Nga Roimata O'Sullivan Director 16/08/2023
Gerard John Tully Director 16/08/2023
Julian Michael Maher Director 16/08/2023
Michael Gerard Curtis Chairperson 16/08/2023
Susan Cosgrove Director 16/08/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emma Laura Catalinac Director 10/08/2023
Gillian Margaret Dudfield-Hendren Director 10/08/2023
Nigel Arthur Prince Director 10/08/2023
Sandra Jane Lyall Director 10/08/2023
Sean Patrick Riddiford Conway Director 10/08/2023
Gerard Michael McGreevy Chief Executive 30/11/2020
Xiafang Huang Group Accountant 30/11/2020
Susan Sue Cosgrove Director 25/08/2020
Gordon Stewart Director 31/12/2015
Kevin Alfred Walker Director 31/12/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/08/2023 NOC030
10/09/2020 NOC026
18/02/2020 NOC025
7/01/2020 NOC024
15/10/2019 NOC022
23/01/2015 NOC018
12/12/2012 NOC012
12/11/2012 NOC011
5/11/2012 AR007
23/04/2012 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.