Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Anthony's Waiuku Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Waiuku Parish
CC29135
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
St Anthony's of Waiuku Ecclesiastical Goods Trust 30/06/2008
St Anthony's Waiuku Ecclesiastical Goods Trust 21/12/2022

Address for service

24 Domain Street
Waiuku
2123
7 Kent Street
Waiuku 2123
Saint Marys Bay
Waiuku
2123

Charity's other details

09 235 9633


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Christ the King Owairaka Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Good Shepherd Balmoral Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Cross Henderson Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Cross Papatoetoe Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Family Kerikeri Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Family Korean Flat Bush Eccesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Family Te Atatu Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Name Warkworth/Ss Peter and Paul Puhoi Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Immaculate Conception Ellerslie Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission of the church is expressed in her three-fold responsibility; of proclaiming the word of God, celebrating the sacraments and exercising the ministry of charity. A parish is an intentional community (one in which each person chooses to belong) of the Christian faithful entrusted to a pastoral of a priest. The parish exists so that the community may grow in faith, share faith and transform the world through its faith.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Community development, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF THE DIOCESE OF AUCKLAND A CORPORATION SOLE IS THE TRUSTEE OF THE ASSETS OF THE TRUST WHICH ARE HELD IN TRUST FOR THE CHARITABLE, RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF THE PARISH. SUBJECT TO AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CODE OF CANON LAW OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH. THE PARISH PRIEST IS ENTRUSTED AS PASTOR FOR THE PASTORAL CARE OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHRIST’S FAITHFUL OF THE PARISH UNDER THE AUTHORITY OF THE BISHOP OF AUCKLAND. THE PARISH PASTORAL COUNCIL IS THE CONSULTATIVE BODY WORKING IN COLLABORATION WITH THE PARISH PRIEST TO PRAYERFULLY SET PASTORAL PRIORITIES. THE PARISH FINANCIAL COMMITTEE IS CHARGED WITH HELPING THE PARISH PRIEST, WHO ACTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CODE OF CANON LAW.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This entity has been granted an exemption under s43 from the requirement to supply entity specific rules.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 26/06/2024 $78,560 $74,799 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 25/06/2023 $79,390 $77,549 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/09/2022 1/09/2022 $72,638 $78,402 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 17/10/2021 $69,244 $64,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 15/02/2021 $44,846 $38,463 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 4/06/2019 $70,723 $72,765 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 6/06/2018 $64,599 $71,469 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 4/07/2017 $76,278 $73,841 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 Member of 'Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roman Catholic Bishop of Auckland Trustee 24/12/1994

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/12/2022 NOC008
21/12/2022 NOC007

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.