pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated
CC29325
9429042997559
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

75A Dunlop Road
Te Puke
3119

Charity's other details

07 5737443


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support those waiting surgery and post Op. Phone calls regards wellbeing Bi monthly meetings and postage 3x year of Ostamate Magazine

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Visiting for support

Older people

Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Are on their own. Bimonthly meetings to help share problems.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 12/05/2021 $1,710 $1,881
30/09/2020 12/08/2020 $2,577 $1,676
30/09/2019 11/05/2019 $2,153 $3,258
31/07/2018 23/05/2018 $1,808 $793
30/09/2017 16/06/2017 $1,555 $1,069
30/09/2016 25/11/2016 $8,709 $0
30/09/2015 11/06/2015 $17,092 $21,279
30/09/2014 9/06/2014 $13,928 $8,394
30/09/2013 7/06/2013 $2,884 $3,146
30/09/2012 23/07/2012 $2,437 $1,794
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 14 months from 1 February 2018 to 31 March 2019.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lesley Bruce Cheyne Vice President 8/06/2021
Cindy Hill-Rennie Treasurer 30/04/2019
Stella Jean Fisk Committee 30/04/2019
Richard Bruce McNair Secretary 31/03/2018
Dian Lola Cheyne President 1/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Barbara Mels Committee 8/06/2021
Helen Miller Batchelor Committee 30/04/2019
Nicolas Theodorus Mels Treasurer 30/04/2019
Doug Haigh Committee 31/03/2018
Shirley Youngman Committee 31/03/2018
Ann Beatrice Harold Committee Member 1/05/2017
Neville Compton-Ebbings Vice President 1/05/2017
Rob Tyne Committee 1/05/2017
Bruce Elliot Committee 30/04/2016
Beverly Elisabeth Brake Secretary/Treasurer 15/06/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/06/2021 NOC019
13/06/2021 NOC018
11/05/2019 NOC014
20/07/2018 NOC013
16/05/2018 NOC011
17/06/2017 NOC010
29/04/2016 NOC007
25/06/2015 NOC006
30/05/2013 NOC001
23/07/2012 AR005

Charity Documents