pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
CC37996
9429043153909
Registered

Registration details

23/02/2009
March 15
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Hastings Ostomy Society Incorporated 24/02/2009
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated 17/11/2016

Address for service

55 Te Aute Road
Havelock North
4130

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance the interests and welfare of Ostomates in the Society's area. To promote fellowship for all Ostomates in this area. To make representation to, and liaise with Health Authorities in the Society's area, to ensure that facilities and services available to Ostomatesare of the highest available standard. To elicit assistance from those Medical Supply Companies which manufacture and distribute Ostomy supplies to assist in achieving the above objectives. To do such things that will, in the opinion of the Committee, promote the well-being of the Society. To hire, lease or purchase or otherwise aquire, any goods or property that will further the objectives of the Society. To collect or raise money in any lawful manner for the use and attainment of all or any of the objects of the Society. To be an affiliated member of the Federation of NZ Ostomy Societies Inc,

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Social Activities / Provides Advice and Care For Ostomates

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(All Ages Of People Who Have Ostomies (Disability)), Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Officers of the Society are elected at the AGM.> Patron David Mason President- Who chairs General and Management Meetings. Vice President -Who chairs meetings in the absence of the President. Secretary Treasurer The Management Committee consists of the President,Vice President,Secretary,Treasurer and five Ordinary members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 16/06/2020 $2,380 $1,114
30/09/2019 16/12/2019 $795 $1,876
30/09/2018 16/07/2019 $1,014 $1,864
30/09/2017 13/10/2017 $1,513 $1,198
30/09/2016 15/09/2016 $1,221 $1,266
30/09/2015 25/06/2015 $1,061 $991
30/09/2014 2/07/2014 $1,474 $1,958
30/09/2013 11/07/2013 $769 $982
30/09/2012 10/08/2012 $22,608 $17,321
30/09/2011 2/09/2011 $1,560 $1,667

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Charles Ide On Committee new position Vice President 1/12/2020
Harold Charles Marett committee member 8/05/2019
Maurice Cambell Committee member 8/05/2019
Peter Charles Ide Committee Member 10/05/2017
Anne O'Kane Committee member 9/05/2012
William Hugh Thornton President 6/05/2009
Esmene Helen Chatterton Treasurer 7/05/2008
Paul Herbert Lister Secretary 7/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Diana Jeanette Lincoln Vice President 1/12/2020
Norma Gail Thornton Committee Member 24/01/2019
Keith Smith Committee Member 8/08/2018
Deorwyn Margaret Baker Committee Member 31/03/2016
Beryl Fay McGarvey Treasurer 31/03/2015
Robert David McGarvey Committee Member 31/03/2015
Sherrin Glassey Treasurer 31/10/2011
Manu Iti Committee Member 11/08/2011
Harold Charles Marett President 5/05/2010
Margaret Baker Vice President 5/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/07/2019 NOC017
13/10/2017 NOC014
26/09/2016 NOC011
24/05/2015 NOC009
2/07/2014 NOC008
2/07/2014 NOC007
10/08/2012 NOC003
1/02/2012 NOC002
2/09/2011 AR005
3/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents