Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group.

Group members are required to complete individual annual returns. This information is available on each charity's individual summary.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust
Tama Asset Holding Company Limited

Group Details


Deregistration details

Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group
CC38558
Deregistered
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
16/04/2015

Following were the details for Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group at the date of deregistration:

Ngati Tama Manawhenua Ki Te Tau Ihu Trust Group

Registration details

Deregistered
30/06/2008
CC38558
September 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 16/04/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 914
Nelson
7040
72 Trafalgar Street
Nelson
7010

Group's other details

(03)548 1740


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please refer to the individual members of this group for their annual return information.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2013 31/03/2014 24/03/2014 $1,297,363 $1,137,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2012 31/03/2013 25/03/2013 $2,343,900 $2,259,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2011 31/03/2012 21/03/2012 $9,715,000 $8,857,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2010 31/03/2011 28/06/2011 $304,000 $481,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2009 31/03/2010 26/03/2010 $1,181 $339 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Health, Environment / conservation, Marae on reservation land, Community development, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Children / young people


Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2013 AR005
28/06/2011 AR003

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.