Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Ambulance New Zealand
CC10012
9429043019281
Deregistered
30/06/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$10,000
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of Ambulance New Zealand at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/02/2007
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/06/2024 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 15/02/2007

Address for service

208 Ohariu Valley Road
Ohariu
Wellington
6037

Charity's other details

0275470334


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Ambulance New Zealand operates a number of national committees and forums to advance the practice of paramedicine and improve the quality of patient care from charity based ambulance service to the New Zealand pubic. These committees address issues such as paramedic education, Standards of clinical care and clinical practice, standards to ensure patients' rights are upheld and met, standards that ensure Emergency Management practice reflects best practice and is responsive to natural disasters in New Zealand. Ambulance New Zealand is also the lead agency for promoting the professionalisation of the paramedic workforce by seeking Paramedic Registration

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Emergency / disaster relief

Health

Other charities

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust Consisting of 4 Trustees with a Chief Executive reporting to the Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 18/06/2024 $207,645 $241,748 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $207,678 $233,363 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 31/07/2022 $200,919 $219,605 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $241,494 $253,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 25/06/2020 $193,885 $249,188 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 26/06/2019 $268,425 $242,046 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 2/07/2018 $212,956 $235,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 18/06/2017 $204,053 $238,147 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 12/06/2016 $305,129 $260,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 14/07/2015 $381,287 $383,127 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Robinson Trustee 1/07/2022
David Sydney Wickham Trustee 19/06/2020
Peter Bradley Trustee 17/10/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Craig Gibbons Trustee 4/07/2023
David Swallow Trustee/ Chairman 1/06/2022
Melwyn Purefoy Smith Trustee 27/05/2022
Greg Barrow Trustee 1/01/2021
Ian Pirie Trustee 1/01/2021
Michael Grant Trustee 1/01/2021
Diana Crossan Trustee 1/06/2017
David Wickham Trustee 8/03/2016
Ross Thomas Martin Trustee 10/05/2013
Jaimes Wood Trustee 27/06/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/07/2023 NOC025
27/06/2023 NOC023
16/12/2022 NOC022
2/07/2018 NOC017
2/02/2017 NOC014
24/02/2014 NOC013
28/06/2013 AR008
7/02/2013 NOC007
22/12/2012 NOC006
25/11/2011 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.