Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Wellington City Mission (Anglican) Trust Board
Wellington City Mission
CC21786
9429042839675
Registered

Registration details

12/03/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 7477
Newtown
Wellington
6242
4 Oxford Terrace
Mount Cook
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

04 245 0900
Facebook.com/thewellingtoncitymission
Instagram.com/wellingtoncitymission


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Wellington City Mission Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The Wellington City Mission (Anglican) Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Mission prides itself on being open to anyone who needs assistance - regardless of their religious belief, age, ethnicity, or social background. Our Mission programmes assist a range of people living in Greater Wellington's communities. The Mission also operates Transitional Housing facilities and an elder care residential facility (Kemp Home and Hospital).

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Community Services

Other (please state)

(Those who are at risk or struggling in the Greater Wellington region.)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Alexander McKenzie Brown Trustee 1/02/2025
Katherine Anne Lawrence Trustee 28/02/2024
Ngahihi o te ra Bidois Trustee 28/02/2024
Meredith Maamari Havelund STEPHENS Trustee 28/02/2022
John Douglas Maurice Trustee 28/02/2020
Scott Grady Scoullar Trustee 31/12/2019
Murray Llewellyn Edridge City Missioner 14/05/2018
Susan Brown Trustee 14/12/2017
Christopher Gray Secretary and GM Corporate Services 1/10/2017
Maria Celeste Millin Director Residential Services 1/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lilias Catriona Maighearad Bell Trustee 31/12/2024
Mary Pearcey Gilchrist Trustee 31/12/2024
Darryl James Gardiner Trustee 31/03/2023
Anthony Te Atawhai Tibble Trustee 28/02/2021
Jonathan Peter Hartley Trustee 24/06/2020
Michael James Wood Trustee 31/03/2020
Marie Jane Cheape Trustee 12/12/2018
Jeremy Charles Neeve Trustee 14/12/2017
Joy Muriel Kennedy Baird Trustee 14/12/2017
Garry Maxwell Wilson Trustee 22/02/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/03/2025 NOC035
17/05/2024 NOC033
1/08/2019 NOC028
4/04/2019 NOC026
15/03/2019 NOC025
19/12/2018 NOC024
9/08/2017 NOC021
14/07/2017 NOC020
11/08/2015 NOC016
7/11/2013 NOC015
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.