Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Age Concern (Flaxmere) Incorporated
CC24795
9429042576167
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

38 Bristol Crescent
Flaxmere
Hastings
4120

Charity's other details

(06) 879 7003


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Age Concern Hawkes Bay Regional. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Age Concern (Flaxmere) Incorporated
Age Concern Havelock North Incorporated
Age Concern Napier Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Principle object of Age Concern Flaxmere is to benefit the Community, support and enhance the quality of life, dignity, health, well being and interest of Older Persons. Age Concern will endeavor to ensure that its work in promoting the Principle object is consistent with the principles of the Treaty of Waitangi. We are active and vocal on relevant issues and work to insure older people stay connected with their Whanau, Friends and Community. We want to help stamp out social isolation which is deeply felt by those that have lost a spouse or have no family to visit them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Social services, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

a) The officers of Age Concern shall be a Chairperson, a Vice Chairperson, a Secretary, a Treasurer, an Accountant has been appointed as Moore Markhams Hawkes Bay Ltd. b) The Offices of Secretary and Treasurer may be filled by the same member of Age Concern. c) Should any of the offices in 7a become vacant between Annual General Meetings, such vacancies may be filled by the Board. d) The Treasurer shall be responsible for the safe custody of the funds.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 25/02/2025 $42,099 $49,974 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 12/10/2023 $63,116 $48,188 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/01/2023 $40,403 $49,619 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 2/12/2021 $84,295 $52,642 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 29/01/2021 $60,695 $44,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 2/03/2021 $62,254 $54,594 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 9/02/2020 $81,882 $82,070 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/01/2019 $63,180 $87,956 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 15/05/2017 $121,758 $121,199 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 11/10/2015 $125,101 $126,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jualaine Bernstone Secretary 12/10/2023
Pat Whatuira Board member 16/11/2020
Tania Sorensen Paku Vice Chair Person 16/09/2020
Evelyn How Treasurer 20/11/2019
Patricia Te Maari Kerei Manager 16/09/2019
Lesley Jewel Hurrey Chairperson 19/03/2018
Jeanette Makirere Board Member 22/11/2017
Ralph Hurrey Board Member 22/11/2017
Ricci Bradey Board Member 22/11/2017
Brian Hobson Board Member 30/09/2016
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vicki Vine Board member 21/03/2022
Allan Humphrey Board Member 20/11/2019
Fae Andersen Board member 20/11/2019
Jessie Kereru Board Member 20/11/2019
Kaa Ropiha Board member 20/11/2019
Mokoenga Kavana Board Member 19/03/2018
Eunice Atutahi Board Member 23/11/2017
Tui Walker Board Member 23/11/2017
Fae Andersen Board Member 30/09/2016
Patricia Whatuira Board Member 30/09/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/02/2021 NOC023
26/01/2021 NOC021
7/01/2020 NOC019
5/11/2019 NOC018
1/11/2019 NOC017
3/12/2018 NOC015
27/03/2018 NOC014
23/03/2017 NOC012
3/03/2015 NOC011
4/11/2014 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.