Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Parkinsonism Society South Canterbury Division Incorporated
Parkinson's South Canterbury
CC27394
9429042802884
Deregistered
30/03/2018

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$32,234
$10,000

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of Parkinsonism Society South Canterbury Division Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PARKINSONS SC
PO Box 983
Timaru
7940
27 Strathallan Street
Timaru
7910

Charity's other details

03 687 7365


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support, education and information for people with Parkinson's and Parkinsonism conditions, their families, carers and health professionals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Health Professionals

Entity Structure

Parkinson's South Canterbury is a membership based society with an Executive Committee elected by the society's members at each AGM. The Executive Committee consists of a Chair, Treasurer and Secretary and not more than ten other members. The Society is a member of Parkinson's New Zealand (the national body for people with Parkinson's) and is affiliated with the other members each of which provides services to people with Parkinson's in their own geographical region.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 24/06/2016 $34,270 $50,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 28/05/2015 $49,934 $50,275 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 23/06/2014 $26,917 $46,498 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 18/06/2013 $31,393 $43,379 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 14/06/2012 $55,000 $41,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 29/04/2011 $41,158 $36,666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 22/06/2010 $40,148 $37,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2008 30/06/2009 2/06/2009 $33,970 $36,647 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Donald Morris Committee Member 7/03/2017
Patricia Bentley Committee Member 7/03/2017
Colin Marshall Committee Member 20/04/2016
Kay Beatson Treasurer 20/04/2016
Janet Grieve Committee Member 16/03/2016
Sharleyne Kaye Diamond Social Co-ordinator 16/02/2015
Margaret Bates Committee Chairperson 26/03/2013
Helen Riddell Community Educator 30/04/2012
Frederick Brown Committee Member 6/03/2012
Mabel Ineson Committee Member 13/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sharon Elizabeth Jester Committee Member 7/03/2017
Pamela Irene Hunter Committee Member 10/01/2017
Colin Marshal Committee Member 26/07/2016
Robin Byrne Committee Member 20/04/2016
Sharon Elizabeth Jester Committee Member 20/04/2016
Joan Doake Committee Member 16/12/2015
Peter Gilchrist Committee Member 7/07/2015
John Anthony Fitzgerald Committee Member 14/05/2015
Janet Mary Grieve Chairperson 24/03/2015
Beverley Ruth Wallace Co-ordinator 28/02/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/06/2017 NOC013
19/08/2016 NOC012
26/07/2016 NOC011
4/07/2016 NOC010
29/06/2016 NOC009
24/06/2016 NOC008
28/05/2015 NOC007
18/06/2013 AR006
14/06/2012 AR005
29/04/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.