Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Parkinsonism Society Taranaki Incorporated
Parkinsons Taranaki / Taranaki PSNZ
CC27395
9429042802891
Deregistered
29/06/2018

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Parkinsonism Society Taranaki Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5015
Westown
New Plymouth
4343
28 Young Street
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

06 7590019


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

At all times be a charitable body within the laws of New Zealand and no power in the rules shall be exercised so as to negative the charitable status of the Division.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Other (please state)

(Parkinsons Support), Education / training / research, Social services, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(People with Parkinsons), Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Structure of the Branch consists of Chairperson, Vice Chairperson, Secretary, Treasurer and a Committee of no less than 5 persons.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 Member of 'Parkinson's New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 25/06/2016 $48,462 $59,702 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 3/05/2016 $52,275 $54,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 8/07/2014 $30,751 $46,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 25/06/2013 $23,640 $50,119 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 14/06/2012 $49,000 $46,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 29/04/2011 $48,098 $41,724 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 28/06/2010 $45,099 $39,158 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2008 30/06/2009 2/06/2009 $51,115 $36,802 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ann Leek Committee 1/05/2017
Pam McGuiness Committee 1/04/2017
Robert Allemann Treasurer 1/04/2017
Beverley Prankerd Secretary 16/03/2016
Dorothy Horwell Committee member 16/03/2016
Ian Lamb Committee Member 16/03/2016
Keith Houghton Committee Member 16/03/2016
Mary Elizabeth Vinnicombe Committee member 16/03/2016
Ruth Wiseman Committee Member 16/03/2016
Sandy Jones Committee 15/03/2016
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gail Potroz Treasurer 1/04/2017
Helen Hall Committee Member 25/06/2016
Jill Richmond Community Educator 1/01/2016
Chris Hinton Treasurer 17/03/2015
Jean Anne Thorne Coimmittee Member 17/03/2015
Ron Rickman Committee Member 17/03/2015
Sally Houghton Committee Member 17/03/2015
James Hall Committee Member 18/03/2014
Michele Burnside Administrator 18/03/2014
Gail Potroz Committee Member 19/03/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/06/2017 NOC009
4/05/2016 NOC008
6/04/2016 NOC007
9/07/2014 NOC006
25/06/2013 AR006
14/06/2012 AR005
29/04/2011 AR004
28/06/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.