pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Ostomy New Zealand
CC29272
9429042713098
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 56086
Tawa
Wellington
5249
27A Tremewan Street
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

0508678669


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To work together with families, all medical professionals, and local authorities to ensure Ostomates and persons with related surgeries of every age and culture in New Zealand receive free of charge, the best care and equipment that will enable them to lead normal lives of optimum quality

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Persons of all ages

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society governed by an Executive Council of up to eight volunteers elected from the member societies.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 7/10/2021 $62,700 $31,029
30/09/2020 25/04/2021 $53,352 $65,477
30/09/2019 20/08/2019 $49,199 $55,638
30/09/2018 26/08/2018 $61,758 $62,076
30/09/2017 25/07/2017 $56,427 $56,965
30/09/2016 31/08/2016 $45,695 $50,613
30/09/2015 22/09/2015 $10,243 $10,699
30/09/2014 10/08/2014 $10,505 $12,675
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $11,033 $11,410

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael John Sumner Vice-President 28/03/2022
Brent Richard Silcock Committee 8/08/2021
David Christopher Barnes Secretary 8/08/2021
Brent Hamlin Treasurer 25/09/2020
Janet Lynn Haines President 16/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kallia Patching President 6/03/2022
Robyn Olive Tourell Secretary 4/03/2022
Jill Annette Newton President 8/08/2021
Richard Bruce McNair Treasurer 30/11/2020
Shelley-Anne McDougall Vice President 25/09/2020
Brent Richard Silcock Committee 11/08/2019
David Christopher Barnes Vice President 11/08/2019
Lee King Secretary 11/08/2019
Robyn Gall Treasurer 11/08/2019
Karl Robert Moen Committee 4/08/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/05/2022 NOC034
8/10/2021 NOC032
25/04/2021 NOC031
25/09/2020 NOC029
30/08/2019 NOC028
1/04/2018 NOC025
5/08/2017 NOC023
26/09/2016 NOC021
21/08/2016 NOC019
10/05/2016 NOC018

Charity Documents