Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Sisters Of Mercy Ministries New Zealand Trust
CC31481
9429043164172
Deregistered
31/03/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Sisters Of Mercy Ministries New Zealand Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/03/2024 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry out the apostolic works of Nga Whaea Atawhai o Aotearoa Sisters of Mercy New Zealand within New Zealand. This includes the delivery of healthcare, education, community and social services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Employment, Religious activities

General public

Entity Structure

Sisters of Mercy New Zealand Trust is an entity incorporated and domiciled in New Zealand. This entity, together with its subsidiaries comprise the Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand Trust Group

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kilistina Tupou Maliu'oehau Vaeatangitau Trustee 12/12/2019
Mary Bernadette Wood Trustee 12/12/2019
Judith Patricia Moroney Trustee 12/12/2014
Raylene Anne Dwyer Trustee 12/12/2014
Susan Jayne France Trustee 12/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katrina Fabish Trustee 12/12/2019
Tui Heather Louise Cadigan Trustee 12/12/2019
Katrina Fabish Trustee 1/08/2016
Anne Pauline Campbell Trustee 12/12/2014
Mary Frances Catherwood Trustee 12/12/2014
Natalie Mary Murphy Trustee 12/12/2014
Tui Heather Louise Cardigan Trustee 12/12/2014
Denise Margaret Fox Trustee 12/12/2009
Kathleen Patricia Lynch Trustee 12/12/2009
Patricia Rowe Trustee 12/12/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/05/2022 NOC021
9/02/2022 NOC018
30/01/2020 NOC015
2/03/2017 NOC009
7/04/2016 NOC006
27/10/2015 NOC005
27/10/2015 NOC004
19/12/2014 NOC003
29/01/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 5 December 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.