Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whanau Tahi Limited
CC31651
9429038983368
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Waipareira Financial Services Limited 30/06/2008
Whanau Tahi Limited 3/10/2011

Address for service

PO Box 21081
Henderson
Auckland
650
13 Edsel Street
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

(09)8366683
(09)8384314

Oceania

Australia

North America

United States


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Whanau o Waipareira Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Housing for Social Benefits Limited
Te Pou Matakana Tuararo Limited
Te Whanau O Waipareira Trust
Wai-Health Limited
Waiora Healthcare Trust
Waipareira Investments Limited
Wai-Tech Limited
Whanau Tahi Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide services to the West Auckland community in IT and consultaing

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(IT and consulting)

Other (please state)

(IT and consulting)

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Leon Wijohn Chair 14/03/2022
John Henry Tamihere Director 28/11/2019
Raymond Paul Noonan Director 29/03/2017
Raymond Hall Director 8/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Aubrey Keung Director 2/08/2022
Evelyn Taumaunu Director 14/03/2022
Ngaire Te Hira Director 20/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/08/2022 NOC017
31/03/2022 NOC015
15/03/2022 NOC014
15/03/2022 NOC013
21/06/2018 NOC008
31/03/2017 NOC006
18/12/2014 NOC004
25/11/2014 NOC002
14/03/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.