Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The New Plymouth Branch of the New Zealand Society of Genealogists
NPNZSG
CC33804
N/A
Deregistered
01/12/2021

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$69,407
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of The New Plymouth Branch of the New Zealand Society of Genealogists at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 1/12/2021 The charity is merging or has merged with another registered charity
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

122 Wairau Road
Oakura
4314

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide educational opportunities and research resources for the development of knowledge, skills and practice in family history, genealogy and whakapapa, for members and the wider community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Promotion of genealogical and related research by bringing together people with an interest in the same Preservation and availability of associated records via indexing projects and library services.)

Other (please state)

(Research, education and library services.)

Other (please state)

(Members and associates plus opportunities for the wider community.)

Entity Structure

The Branch is administered by a ten-person Committee that is elected by its members each year. All committee members act in a voluntary capacity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/06/2022 $4,645 $3,205 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 15/06/2021 $4,192 $4,886 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/07/2020 $8,583 $7,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/05/2019 $6,147 $5,131 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/06/2018 $6,674 $6,067 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/06/2017 $6,071 $6,873 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 22/08/2016 $6,739 $6,415 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 8/05/2015 $9,429 $10,456 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 14/05/2014 $5,796 $8,637 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 30/05/2013 $5,802 $7,127 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graeme Victor Jury Committee 4/05/2021
Lorraine Margaret Austin Committee 4/05/2021
Karen Crowe Committee Member 28/07/2020
Sharyn Guthrie Treasurer 17/07/2020
Gail Maree Tanner Convenor 7/05/2019
Patricia Lea Bellini Committee Member 2/05/2017
Annette Helen Larsen Committee Member 3/05/2016
Jackie Sewell Secretary 5/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Christian Bellini Committee Member 4/05/2021
Graham Maurice Cowley Committee member 7/07/2020
Jill Jackson Committee Member 7/07/2020
Lorraine Margaret Austin Committee Member 7/07/2020
Neville Graham Richards Committee Member 7/07/2020
Beverley Anne Mulqueen Committee Member 6/05/2019
Judith Mary Berntsen Committee Member 18/11/2018
Charles William Le Breton Committee Member 29/08/2017
Ailsa Janet Mccrone Committee member 2/05/2017
John Bernhard Berntsen Committee Member 2/05/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/11/2021 NOC024
15/06/2021 NOC022
17/07/2020 NOC020
14/12/2018 NOC018
27/06/2017 NOC015
7/03/2017 NOC013
22/08/2016 NOC011
13/06/2016 NOC010
8/05/2015 NOC009
14/05/2014 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.