Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

St John Emergency Communications Limited
St John
CC35173
9429035091639
Deregistered
30/06/2019

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of St John Emergency Communications Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/06/2019 The charity is merging or has merged with another registered charity
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

Private Bag 14902
Panmure
Auckland
1741
St John Ambulance Headquarters
2 Harrison Road
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1060

Charity's other details

09 579 1015


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of St John. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Order of St John Great Barrier Island
St John Alexandra Area Committee
St John Ambulance Financial Control Board - Timaru
St John Amuri Area Committee
St John Banks Peninsula Area Committee
St John Bay Of Islands Area Committee
St John Benneydale Area Committee
St John Bream Bay (Marsden) Area Committee
St John Buller Area Committee
The Priory In New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The company has within New Zealand, full capacity, rights, powers and privileges to carry on or undertake any business or activity, do any act, or enter into any transaction, in each case directly or indirectly in furtherance of any Charitable Purpose, including, the arrangement for the establishment, operation, management, administration, control and maintenance of ambulance communications centres, so as to provide 24 hours communications centre services for the answering, processing and despatching of emergency calls for ambulance services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

St John Emergency Communications Limited is a wholly owned subsidiary of The Priory in New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing a notice of change form with their amended rules on 4 February 2016 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 17/12/2014 $18,258,385 $16,840,426 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 18/12/2013 $18,529,000 $17,345,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Bradley Director 26/09/2012
Geoffrey Thomas Ridley Director 17/10/2011
Gary Maxwell Wilson Director 23/02/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Thomas Dodd Director 26/09/2012
Jaimes Dawson Wood Director 29/06/2012
Anthony Edward Blaber Director 30/09/2011
Edward Oral Sullivan Director 6/07/2011
Robert George Mappin Fenwick Director 23/02/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/03/2013 NOC014
27/09/2012 NOC013
4/07/2012 NOC012
14/11/2011 NOC011
18/10/2011 NOC010
7/10/2011 NOC009
6/09/2011 NOC008
22/07/2010 NOC007
3/11/2009 AR002
20/10/2009 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.