Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Taikura Trust
CC35290
9429043002498
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 132324
Sylvia Park
Auckland
1644
570 Mount Wellington Highway
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1062

Charity's other details

09 278 6314
09 270 6500


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Taikura Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Kaikaranga Holdings Limited
Taikura Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promote, support and advance people with disabilities and organisations and whanau that support disabled people; advance community awareness and capability to support disabled people; recognise the responsibilities of partnership in relation to Te Tiriti o Waitangi and to liaise with Maori and other cultural groups to provide services which are culturally acceptable to all New Zealanders; influence the development of policies, strategies and practices which impact on services aimed at enhancing the wellbeing of disabled people and their communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Disability support services)

People with disabilities

Health

People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Kaikaranga Holdings Limited CC58764
Taikura Trust Charitable Holding Company Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Taikura Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/09/2023 $9,715,000 $9,484,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 23/12/2021 $8,022,000 $7,560,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/01/2021 $6,411,000 $6,690,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $6,112,000 $6,308,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $5,960,000 $5,783,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 15/12/2017 $6,010,000 $5,960,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $6,326,000 $6,136,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 1/12/2015 $6,707,998 $7,001,283 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacinta Tevaga Trustee 1/07/2019
Tracy Walters Trustee 1/05/2010
Pare Rauwhero Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Puhara Trustee 8/12/2020
Miria Andrews Trustee 8/12/2020
Ava Fa'amoe Trustee 30/06/2019
Hamish Crooks Trustee 13/12/2016
Siro Fuata'i Trustee 31/10/2011
Ngaroma Tahana Trustee 31/05/2010
Matewiki Karehana Trustee 31/03/2010
Mama Tere Strickland Trustee 30/09/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2015 NOC005
15/01/2013 AR005
16/04/2012 AR004
13/01/2011 AR003
18/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.