Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Motor Neurone Disease Association of New Zealand (Incorporated)
MND New Zealand
CC35320
9429042784746
Deregistered
01/01/2025

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of The Motor Neurone Disease Association of New Zealand (Incorporated) at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 1/01/2025 The charity is merging or has merged with another registered charity
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 24036
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
14 Erson Avenue
Royal Oak
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

09 624 2148
https://www.facebook.com/mndanz
https://www.linkedin.com/company/mndnz/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To deliver the best quality support service for those living with MND in Aotearoa New Zealand. This includes (but not limited to) - providing vital community-based support to people living with MND, their family and carers; co-ordinate and provide up-to-date information and education about MND, provide emotional, social and practical support, advocate for the needs of people living with MND, connect people living with MND with health and social services that help them live with dignity and the best quality of life possible, develop awareness and understanding of MND; lead, encourage and fund research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Health, Social services

People with disabilities

Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society
Motor Neurone Disease New Zealand Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 Dec 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 Dec 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 18/12/2024 $100,180 $18,416 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 29/02/2024 26/09/2024 $747,823 $991,218 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/12/2022 $867,449 $1,397,678 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 22/12/2021 $2,085,071 $1,323,023 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 3/11/2020 $1,479,439 $1,232,367 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $1,016,402 $1,117,311 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 27/11/2018 $1,092,168 $965,385 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 3/12/2017 $929,621 $865,251 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $726,156 $767,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 14/12/2015 $616,327 $563,492 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Thomas Leggett Trustee 1/02/2023
Patricia Anne Sloan Council Member 20/08/2022
Estelle Arts Council Member 30/10/2021
Alan Michael Stanley Council Member 31/10/2020
Lucyna Haberfield Chairperson 17/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Caron Michelle Palmer Deputy Chairperson 25/11/2023
Melanie Glenn Council Member 14/10/2023
Christine Sawers Council Member 18/07/2022
Michael John Fuyala Council Member 26/02/2022
Natalie Thain Chairperson 30/10/2021
Samarra Wright-Scott Council Member 25/08/2021
Nicholas Damian Molcsan Council Member 3/07/2021
Wayne Alexander Philip Council Member 3/07/2021
Gregory Bernard Horton Chairperson 1/05/2021
Christopher John Drennan Council Member 28/01/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/02/2024 NOC029
14/11/2022 NOC027
23/08/2022 NOC026
27/04/2022 NOC025
19/04/2022 NOC024
1/09/2021 NOC022
7/07/2021 NOC021
26/05/2021 NOC020
10/03/2021 NOC019
7/06/2019 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.