pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ngai Tahu Capital Limited
Ngai Tahu Equities Trust
CC35571
9429038170423
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011
PO Box 13046
Armagh
Wigram
Christchurch
8141

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Capital (Australia) Limited
Ngai Tahu Capital Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable trust)

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied To Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other charities

Other Charities - Ngai Tahu charitable trust

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Eric Pohio Officer 1/12/2021
Kristen Jane Kohere-Soutar Officer 16/08/2021
Juliet Keri Tainui-Hernandez Officer 1/12/2020
Darryn John Russell Officer 19/10/2018
Mark Tume Officer 19/10/2018
Rodger John Finlay Officer 19/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Walter Leonard Stone Officer 30/11/2021
Tutehounuku Korako Officer 2/12/2020
Michael Eric Pohio Officer 6/01/2020
Paul Silk Officer 18/10/2019
Quentin Cheyne Selwyn Hix Officer 17/10/2019
Rodger John Finlay Officer 19/10/2018
Catherine Margaret Drayton Officer 15/09/2018
Trevor Burt Officer 1/08/2018
Samford (sandy) Lee Maier Trustee 30/08/2013
Ross Keenan Director 31/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/12/2021 NOC026
12/05/2021 NOC024
10/12/2020 NOC023
21/01/2020 NOC021
18/10/2019 NOC020
17/10/2019 NOC019
28/08/2019 NOC018
30/10/2018 NOC016
30/10/2018 NOC015
17/09/2018 NOC014

Charity Documents