Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Plymouth Riding for the Disabled Association Incorporated
CC38920
9429042684121
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
New Plymouth Group, Riding for the Disabled Association Incorporated 30/06/2008
New Plymouth Riding for the Disabled Association Incorporated 21/07/2021

Address for service

PO Box 5015
Westown
New Plymouth
4343
1 Alba Street
Alba Street
Whalers Gate
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

06 7526814
https://www.facebook.com/NPRDA/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Group Members


Below are all the members of Riding For The Disabled New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Deliver safe and effective programmes for people with disabilities, to increase abilities, independence and self esteem.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/06/2024 $246,586 $207,769 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 6/06/2023 $153,707 $155,918 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/06/2022 $159,272 $141,962 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 3/04/2021 $300,375 $96,708 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 9/06/2020 $216,135 $115,866 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 12/07/2019 $129,542 $107,628 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $89,862 $75,114 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 15/08/2017 $100,935 $82,213 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 16/06/2016 $103,412 $76,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kay Yvonne Kendall Committee 1/08/2024
Maria Deborah Setu Committee 1/08/2024
Sheree Ann Hopkins Assistant Treasurer 1/11/2022
Claire Chamberlain Trustee 1/06/2022
Sheryl Walker Committee 16/06/2021
Sarah Emma-Jane McIntyre Treasurer 18/03/2021
Valerie Samantha Barraclough Funding Officer 18/03/2021
Kevin Nielsen President 8/03/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richelle Grace Landers Fundraising Co-ordinator 16/05/2024
Lynda Joyce Bennett Secretary 30/11/2022
Judith Heeley Past President 31/05/2022
Fiona Margaret Munro Secretary 31/07/2021
Claire Margaret Carroll Committee Member 18/03/2021
Claire Chamberlain Committee Member 18/03/2021
Pamela Livingston Health and Safety Officer 18/03/2021
Patricia Gillbanks Committee Member 18/03/2021
Scott Jackson Treasurer 18/03/2021
Gaynor Marie Laurence Secretary 31/07/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/03/2025 NOC032
19/07/2023 NOC030
18/12/2022 NOC028
23/06/2022 NOC027
11/03/2022 NOC025
21/07/2021 NOC024
16/06/2021 NOC023
14/09/2020 NOC021
5/09/2019 NOC019
4/09/2019 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.