Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Timaru Group Riding for the Disabled Association Incorporated
Riding for the Disabled Association Timaru Group Incorporated
CC38933
9429042816584
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

36 Landsborough Road
RD 4
Otipua Creek
Timaru
7974

Charity's other details

03 684 4282
facebook.com/timaru rda


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Riding For The Disabled New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Confidence, independence and well being for people with disabilities, through therapeutic horse riding and horse care.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Group Committee Structure: Timaru RDA is managed and governed by a volunteer committee. Operational Structure: our Horse Care operations are managed by a team of paid employees and volunteers. Timaru RDA is one of 55 Groups in New Zealand, affiliated to NZ Riding for the Disabled, providing therapeutic opportunities for children and adults with various challenges.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/06/2024 $111,423 $106,063 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 27/06/2023 $208,093 $86,997 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 26/05/2022 $379,471 $89,397 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 9/06/2021 $99,645 $70,558 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 19/05/2020 $71,562 $79,970 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 1/05/2019 $60,121 $76,002 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 22/05/2018 $68,338 $67,862 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 9/05/2017 $53,255 $62,312 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 15/05/2016 $48,708 $52,517 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Sullivan Committee Member 18/04/2023
Christina Blissett Vice President 16/03/2021
Karina Stevens President 16/03/2021
Emma Gilbert Secretary 21/03/2018
Alison Farren Treasurer 31/03/2007
Heather Fay Aitken Committee Member 31/03/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Deb Walker Committee Member 31/12/2023
Liz Mills Committee Member 31/12/2023
Shirley Denize Vice President 31/12/2023
Wendy Marr Committee Member 31/12/2023
Hazel Ruth Marshall Committee Member 15/03/2022
Richard Prins Committee Member 15/03/2022
Emma Reynolds secretary 17/03/2020
Margaret Baker Committee Member 19/03/2019
Anne Margaret Russell Committee member 21/03/2018
Gillian Collins President 21/03/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/05/2023 NOC017
26/05/2022 NOC015
9/06/2021 NOC013
8/05/2020 NOC011
12/04/2017 NOC007
29/06/2013 AR006
24/05/2012 AR005
15/06/2011 NOC002
16/06/2010 AR003
29/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.