Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Arohanui Hospice Foundation
CC40357
9429043048472
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5349
Terrace End
Palmerston North
4441
1 Heretaunga Street
Palmerston North
4414

Charity's other details

06 356 6606
06 355 0453


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Arohanui Hospice Service Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Arohanui Hospice Foundation
Arohanui Hospice Service Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Arohanui Hospice Foundation was established to support the financial viability of the Arohanui Hospice Service Trust. The primary purpose of Arohanui Hospice Foundation is to raise funds to assist with the costs incurred by Arohanui Hospice Service Trust in providing palliative care services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Makes Grants to Arohanui Hospice Only

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health

Other (please state)

(Arohanui Hospice Service Trust)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Curtis Walker Trustee 1/02/2022
Bryan Guy Trustee 27/07/2021
Julie Knighton Trustee 27/07/2021
David John Andrews Trustee 29/09/2020
Sharon Mary Wards Trustee 29/09/2020
Michelle Anne Connor Director Foundation 28/04/2020
Murray Allan Georgel Trustee 1/11/2016
Lorraine Vincent Chair 1/11/2014
Clare Jane Randall Chief Executive 4/10/2010
John Freebairn Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bernard Hanaray Trustee 26/11/2024
Ross Hadwin Trustee 16/07/2024
Lindy Purdy Trustee 28/10/2023
Roger Clausen Trustee 30/11/2021
Fred Hirst Trustee 28/09/2021
Timothy Mordaunt Trustee 25/05/2021
Mary Mckenna Trustee 11/09/2019
Charlie Pedersen Deputy Chairman 26/09/2017
Paul Warren Rieger Trustee 18/07/2017
Esther Willis Trustees 6/08/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/12/2024 NOC023
3/02/2022 NOC019
2/12/2021 NOC018
15/10/2021 NOC017
26/05/2021 NOC015
25/02/2019 NOC012
18/08/2015 NOC008
29/12/2014 NOC007
16/07/2013 NOC003
5/10/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.