Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Runanga O Te Whanau
Te Runanga O Te Whanau Charitable Trust
CC40634
9429042850946
Registered

Registration details

7/06/2009
June 30

Address for service

R D 3, State Highway 35
Te Kaha
Opotiki
3199

Charity's other details

07 325 2726
07 325 2739


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Runanga o Te Whanau Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cyberwaka Limited
Te Runanga O Te Whanau
TWA Fishing Company Limited
TWA Health and Social Services Limited
TWA Holding Company Limited
TWA Holiday Park Limited
TWA Resort Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

An Iwi under the mantle of Te Atua and that is living in balance and harmony with Te Ao Turoa, actively maintaining and developing internal and external relationships, it’s Matauranga base, its Mana, its Reo, its tikanga and all taonga to ensure that present and future generations achieve environmental, economic, social, cultural and political security.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Te Whanau A Apanui Iwi

Entity Structure

Hapu appointed delegates to act as Trustee of the Parent Trust, who has 100% owned subsidiary companies where the Chair of the Trust is a Director along with CEO and Fisheries manager as other directors. Total 33 staff working in the Group.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mere Webb Trustee 1/07/2023
Te Huikau Rata Trustee 7/03/2023
Honor Nancy Ross Trustee 16/06/2022
Veronica Te Rangimarie Te Moana Trustee 16/06/2022
Elvis Dobson Shepherd Trustee 17/02/2021
Donna Perese Trustee 20/02/2020
Marijke Warmenhoven Trustee 6/12/2017
Francis Cameron Trustee 20/10/2016
Matetu Herewini Trustee 14/10/2010
Grace Kemara Trustee 8/06/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Whiripare Pahewa-McLean Trustee 1/07/2023
Louis Rapihana Trustee 8/04/2023
Astrid Mereana Tawhai Trustee 15/01/2023
Carol Ngamoki Williams Trustee 16/06/2022
Yvonne Shepherd Trustee 16/06/2022
Adelaide Waititi Trustee 17/02/2021
Kiritahanga Savage Trustee 20/02/2020
Marcia Josephine Insley Trustee 19/09/2019
Con Te Rata Jones Trustee 5/04/2018
Charlie Trinick Trustee 11/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/08/2022 NOC024
4/06/2021 NOC022
4/03/2020 NOC019
25/11/2019 NOC018
13/06/2018 NOC016
6/12/2017 NOC014
10/08/2017 NOC013
27/05/2015 NOC011
23/10/2014 NOC010
29/12/2011 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.