Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Gore and Districts Branch of the Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated
CC45248
9429042631064
Deregistered
01/06/2017

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Gore and Districts Branch of the Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

7/09/2010
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/05/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another charitable entity.
Registered 7/09/2010

Address for service

PO Box 1325
Invercargill
9840
22 Harewood Road
RD 11
New Lynn
Invercargill
9877

Charity's other details

032189684


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Animal rescue and care, Animal Welfare inspectors, advice, information, advocacy, shelter

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Animal Rescue, temporary housing

Care / protection of animals

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Animals

Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Sectioned to the Southland Branch of the Royal Society of New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Inc Membership Based with a annual elected committee.
Southland Branch Of The Royal New Zealand Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 15/02/2017 $17,381 $27,625 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 8/06/2015 $55,840 $86,318 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2014 $186,873 $59,130 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 9/07/2013 $41,707 $60,918 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 5/07/2012 $57,208 $62,172 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lorraine Little Vice Chairperson 18/08/2015
Sam Beer Committee Member 18/08/2015
Patty Tsai Committee member 15/08/2015
Adam Lilley Committee Member 20/03/2015
Darlene Howell Committee member 10/03/2015
Darren Kidd Committee Member 10/03/2015
Michelle Sadlier Committee Member 10/03/2015
Rachel Joan Hucklebridge Chairperson 10/03/2015
Sara Sapwell Committee Member 10/03/2015
Carol Howden Committee Member 10/02/2015
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Heather Wallace Financial Controller 30/08/2015
Ric Odom CEO/Administrator 30/08/2015
Carol Ann Martin National Councillor 12/03/2015
Carol Anne Jackson National Councillor 10/03/2015
David Gardner National Councillor 4/10/2013
Robyn Jane Kippenberger Administrator 9/08/2013
Gordon Trainer National Councillor 28/06/2013
Robert James Kerridge President 28/06/2013
Gwendoline Rose Keel National Councillor 15/06/2013
Jenifer Maud Prattley National Councillor 12/05/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/10/2016 NOC006
10/03/2015 NOC004
3/10/2013 NOC001
9/07/2013 AR002
5/07/2012 AR001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.